skip to content

Zhuruk, Alexandr Nikolayevich

CPSO#: 91317

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Belarusian State Medical University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Surgical Associates Office
236 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 1J5
Phone: (519) 631-0567
Fax: (519) 631-0921 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Zhuruk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zhuruk ( CPSO# 91317 )

Business Address:
Surgical Associates Office
236 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 1J5
Phone Number: (519) 631-0567

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXANDR NIKOLAYEVICH ZHURUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHURUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014