skip to content

Zhuk, Arkadii Abraham

CPSO#: 30285

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Nov 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Jul 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Latvian, Polish, Portuguese, Russian, Ukrainian, Yiddish

Education: Latvian State University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 2003

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Jan 2003
Summary:

On January 16, 2003, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Zhuk(s plea of no contest and found him guilty of professional misconduct with respect to disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct and ordered the following:

1) That Dr. Zhuk attend before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the register.

2) The Registrar shall be directed to suspend Dr. Zhuk(s certificate of registration for a period of (3) three months. The suspension shall itself be suspended provided Dr. Zhuk successfully completes, at his own expense, an ethics course approved by the College to the satisfaction of the Registrar within a period of (12) twelve months from the date of the order; and makes the cost payment in paragraph 3 of this order wihin 60 days of the date of the order, and otherwise to impose the suspension on January 16, 2004.

3) The Discipline Committee orders that Dr. Zhuk pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,000.00 within 60 days of the order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 13, 2003