skip to content

Zhuang, Lihua

CPSO#: 88519

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Apr 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Nantong Medical College, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone: (905) 780-0778
Fax: (905) 780-7969 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lihua Zhuang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Zhuang ( CPSO# 88519 )

Business Address:
Unit 2
160 East Beaver Creek Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3L4
Phone Number: (905) 886-7546

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LIHUA ZHUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHUANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2011

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 16, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

NOTE: All of the elements of this SCERP have been completed, effective July 3, 2018.
Download Full Document (PDF)