skip to content

Zhu, Tina Ruo-Yun

CPSO#: 98584

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Armstrong Level 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 6138930477 Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TINA RUO-YUN ZHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016