skip to content

Zhu, Jiajia

CPSO#: 96742

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West London Family Health Clinic
Suite 200
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: (519) 641-6712
Fax: (519) 641-6189 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jiajia Zhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zhu ( CPSO# 96742 )

Business Address:
200 - 785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712


Corporation Name: Dixon Cunningham-Dunlop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JIAJIA ZHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2011 to 02 Oct 2011
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2012