skip to content

Zhou, Kim

CPSO#: 95134

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Room 369
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: 647-689-5884 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-813-7500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Village Family Health Team
171 East Liberty Street
Unit 102
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Canada
Phone: 416-599-8348
Fax: 416-599-2001
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yau and Zhou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Yau ( CPSO# 96157 )
Dr. K. Zhou ( CPSO# 95134 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1600

Business Address:
102 - 171 East Liberty Street
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone Number: (416) 599-8348

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIM ZHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015