skip to content

Zhou, Jiemin

CPSO#: 95676

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Oct 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Shanghai Second Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Fax: (705) 728-3039 Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JIEMIN ZHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2018