skip to content

Zhou, Alysia Weijia

CPSO#: 97364

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 8
65 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5N7
Phone: (705) 324-9400
Fax: (705) 324-1944 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alysia Zhou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zhou ( CPSO# 97364 )

Business Address:
Suite 8
65 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5N7
Phone Number: (705) 324-9400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALYSIA WEIJIA ZHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 19 Mar 2012 to 12 Apr 2012
EL - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2013 to 26 Sep 2013
EL - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Oct 2013 to 22 Nov 2013
EL - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2015