skip to content

Zherebitskiy, Viktor

CPSO#: 94776

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Odessa Medical University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Feb 2011 to 07 Mar 2011
EL - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 2014 to 11 Jul 2014
EL - Forensic Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jul 2014