Zhelyazkova, Lilyana Ivanova (CPSO#: 101083)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, French

Education:McGill University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Emergency Department
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621 Ext. 4212
Fax: 613-748-4971
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lilyana Ivanova Zhelyazkova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Zhelyazkova ( CPSO# 101083)

Business Address:
Montford Hospital
Emergency Department
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILYANA IVANOVA ZHELYAZKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHELYAZKOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2016