skip to content

Zhao, Ying Ying

CPSO#: 88379

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 7
55 Frid Street
Hamilton ON  L8P 4M3
Phone: (905) 529-2259
Fax: 905-529-2262 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 401
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N3V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 639-3209
Fax: (905) 639-3452
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. Y. Zhao & J. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wong ( CPSO# 84428 )
Dr. Y. Zhao ( CPSO# 88379 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2

Business Address:
55 Frid Street
Suite 7
Hamilton ON  L8P 4M3
Phone Number: (905) 529-2259

Business Address:
Suite 401
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
DBCVSRI C3 - 13C
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:09 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YING YING ZHAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012