skip to content

Zhao, Janet Qianyi

CPSO#: 100936

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thompson Medical Centre
130 Thompson Road
London ON  N5Z 2Y6
Phone: (519) 601-8621
Fax: (519) 204-3122 Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jul 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JANET QIANYI ZHAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2015