skip to content

Zhang, Yong-Li

CPSO#: 95168

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenbelt Family Health Team
3500 Fallowfield Rd
Ottawa ON  K2J 4A7
Phone: (613) 843-1718
Fax: (613) 843-0201 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Yong-Li Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Zhang ( CPSO# 95168 )

Business Address:
1C - Fallowfield Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 4A7
Phone Number: (613) 843-1718

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YONG-LI ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2013