Zhang, Yimeng (CPSO#: 100300)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sensenbrenner Hospital
101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H5
Phone: (705) 337-6111
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan St N
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 432-4851
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Hôpital Notre-Dame Hospital
1405 Edward St
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Canada
Phone: (705) 362-4291
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yimeng Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Zhang ( CPSO# 100300)

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K1V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Business Address:
Hopital Norte-Dame Hospital
1405 Edward Street
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 362-4291

Business Address:
Sensenbrenner Hospital
101 Progess Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H5
Phone Number: (705) 337-6111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YIMENG ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018