skip to content

Zhang, Xiaxin

CPSO#: 100665

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 233-1271
Fax: (416) 233-3861 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Zhang ( CPSO# 100665)

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Rheumatology
804 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (226) 700-7982

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. XIAXIN ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017