skip to content

Zhang, Wenli

CPSO#: 96931

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Shandong University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone: (905) 780-0778
Fax: (905) 780-7969 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Wenli Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Zhang ( CPSO# 96931 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone Number: (905) 870-0778

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WENLI ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 25 Oct 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 17 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2013