skip to content

Zhang, Ting

CPSO#: 91060

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Mandarin

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
402 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-2550
Fax: (905) 848-5037 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ting Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Zhang ( CPSO# 91060 )

Business Address:
Suite 402
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-2550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TING ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jan 2018
CF - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016