skip to content

Zhang, Rujin

CPSO#: 92575

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 May 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Weifang Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Mar 2010 to 14 May 2010
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Anaesthesia

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 May 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Cardiac Anaesthesia

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012