Zhang, Qi (CPSO#: 95811)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Medical College of QingDao University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Western Ontario
Schulich School of Medicine
Department of Pathology
Room 4044 Dental Sciences Building
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-2111
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Neuropathology Effective: 24 Apr 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. QI ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Oct 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2017