skip to content

Zhang, Han

CPSO#: 97694

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Avenue
Room G811
Hamilton, ON.
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 37031
Fax: 905-521-6121 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HAN ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 04 Jun 2012 to 29 Jun 2012
EL - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Jan 2013 to 11 Mar 2013
EL - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 27 Oct 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2016