skip to content

Zeman-Pocrnich, Cady Erika

CPSO#: 90727

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Names: Zeman, Cady Erika (used until: 19 Jul 2016 )     Pocrnich, Cady Erika (used until: 07 Jul 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 32766 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CADY ERIKA ZEMAN-POCRNICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEMAN-POCRNICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2015