skip to content

Zeman, Robert

CPSO#: 23792

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Jul 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Polish, Slovak

Education:P.J. Safarika University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd, 1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3, Phone:1-800-775-0093, Fax: 647-933-2904
Date Received: 06 Aug 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:28 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective:24 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Mar 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018