skip to content

Zeller, Michelle Paula

CPSO#: 86700

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
H S C 3H54
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73928
Fax: (905) 521-4971 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michelle Zeller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zeller ( CPSO# 86700 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
HSC 3V51B
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Business Address:
35 Stone Church Road
Ancaster ON  L9K 1S5
Phone Number: (905) 304-7467

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:20 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHELLE PAULA ZELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZELLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Transfusion Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2012