skip to content

Zeller, Jeanne Therese

CPSO#: 89813

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Universite of Rene Descartes (Paris V), 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Division of Dermatology
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6043
Fax: (416) 530-6472 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R & J Zeller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zeller ( CPSO# 85741 )
Dr. J. Zeller ( CPSO# 89813 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6265

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
Division of Dermatology
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6043

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:15 Nov 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 17 Nov 2008
PEAP - CF - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 18 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
CF - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 14 Jan 2011
CF - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2018 Active
             Dr. Jeanne Therese Zeller may practise medicine independently in dermatology.