skip to content

Zelenietz, Caleb Solomon Grant

CPSO#: 97519

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Mar 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. CSGZ Medical Corporation PO Box 69062 Tuxedo Park MB R3P 2G9
Date Received: 15 May 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 31 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
EL - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
EL - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019