skip to content

Zeldin, Edmond Toby

CPSO#: 26546

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 May 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000