skip to content

Zelcer, Irving

CPSO#: 22484

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Dec 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 18-Apr-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients who are looking to request a copy of their medical records can send a written request to: [email protected]
Date Received: 05 Jul 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 10, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Irving Zelcer to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 10, 2016
.
Dr. Zelcer was the subject of a College investigation into whether he failed to maintain the standard of practice. During this investigation, Dr. Zelcer resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

See PDF for full undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)