skip to content

Zeidan Shwiri, Tawfiq

CPSO#: 93417

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2020
EXPIRY DATE
31 Mar 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Apr 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CardioMatters Diagnostics
11-14 398 Steeles Ave W
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X3 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

CardioMatters Diagnostics
658 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

CardioMatters Diagnostics
6633 York Regional Rd 7
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Apr 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2020 Active
             1.    Dr.   Tawfiq   Zeidan   Shwiri   may   practise  internal  medicine  with
                  CardioMatters Diagnostics in Thornhill,  Markham  and  Toronto,  Ontario,
                  while  under  supervision  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to  the
                  College.

            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  three years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Zeidan Shwiri's eligibility  to take the
                  Royal  College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor  notifies  the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Zeidan Shwiri's knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or attitude, does not
                        provide the required reports to the College by  the  due date or if
                        the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Zeidan Shwiri's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on April 1, 2020, and will expire on or before
                  March 31, 2023, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.