skip to content

Zed, Sarah Elizabeth

CPSO#: 94988

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Feb 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Feb 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:07 Nov 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 04 May 2011 to 31 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2014 to 11 Feb 2014
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2014