skip to content

Zec, Michelle Lynette

CPSO#: 96858

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
2nd Floor, EW Room 422
M5T 2S8
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5449
Fax: 416-603-5251 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHELLE LYNETTE ZEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 03 Oct 2011 to 28 Oct 2011
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014