skip to content

Zborovski, Stephen Joshua

CPSO#: 95264

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
302-5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 728-3766
Fax: 7057283757 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Borowoy and Zborovski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Borowoy ( CPSO# 89031 )
Dr. S. Zborovski ( CPSO# 95264 )

Business Address:
201-11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 881-9810

Business Address:
302-5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 728-3766

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:15 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHEN JOSHUA ZBOROVSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZBOROVSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 10 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 10 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 05 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 06 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 05 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016