skip to content

Zayouna, Maher Nafea

CPSO#: 94820

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 300
871 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2C9
Canada
Phone: (519) 252-8800
Fax: (519) 252-8803
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Maher Zayouna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zayouna ( CPSO# 94820 )

Business Address:
300 - 871 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2C9
Phone Number: (519) 252-8800

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:04 Feb 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014 Active
             Dr.  Maher  Nafea  Zayouna  may  practise  medicine  independently  in internal
            medicine, only.