skip to content

Zayed, Saleh Mah'd Saleh

CPSO#: 85916

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Jan 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Zayed, Saleh Mah'd Saleh A (used until: 01 Feb 2007 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Jordan, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: University of Ottawa Helath Services 100 Marie-Curie Ottawa ON K1N 6N5
Date Received: 04 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019