skip to content

Zayed, Rim

CPSO#: 89309

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jan 2021
EXPIRY DATE
31 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Jan 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Public Unit
101 17th St E
Owen Sound ON  N4K 0A5 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 106
450 O'Brien Rd
Renfrew ON  K7V 3Z2
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective:29 Jan 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2010 to 20 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2011 to 20 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2013 to 08 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 12 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jul 2022
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jul 2022 Active
 1. Dr. RIM ZAYED may practise public health and preventive medicine with Grey Bruce Public Unit in Owen Sound, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires on August 31, 2023.
 
3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. ZAYED's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. ZAYED's practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 29 January, 2021, and will expire on or before August 31, 2023, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.