First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Dec 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jul 2022 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2023 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2023 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2024 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 29 Feb 2024 |