Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Male
Languages Spoken: English, Tamil, Urdu
Education: Aga Khan University, 1994
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
No Privileges reported.
Source: Hospital Active Date: February 26, 2016 Expiry Date: Summary: On April 14, 2016, Markham Stouffville Hospital notified the College that Dr. Mohamed Maznawi Zawahir's privileges were suspended, effective February 26, 2016.
(1 of 2) As from June 30, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mohamed Maznawi Zawahir, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Zawahir to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario: UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT ("Undertaking") of DR. MOHAMED ZAWAHIR ("Dr. Zawahir") to COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (the "College") ________________________________________________________________________ A. PREAMBLE (1) In this Undertaking: "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public. (2) I, Dr. Zawahir, certificate of registration number 91801, am a member of the College. The College has received information that I have failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. (3) I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation bearing File Number 7215048 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my anesthesia practice. (4) I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that I have not practiced medicine in Ontario since February 19, 2016. B. UNDERTAKING (5) I, Dr. Zawahir, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately ("Effective Date"). (6) I, Dr. Zawahir, undertake that I will continue to cease to practise medicine in Ontario until each and every one of the following conditions have been met: (a) I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; (b) The ICR Committee approves my return to the practice of medicine; and, (c) I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a program of continuing professional development that meets the requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for continuing professional development set by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada. (7) I, Dr. Zawahir, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall forward a request to the General Manager of OHIP that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise and before the date the College agrees that I may return to practise in accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking. (8) I, Dr. Zawahir, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A". C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS (9) I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking. (10) I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to practice, the ICR Committee may, among other things: (a) request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions being placed upon my certificate of registration, including that I may not be the Most Responsible Physician; and (b) request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or monitoring agreement with the College. (11) I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that I shall also require approval of the Registration Committee before entering into any undertaking which imposes term, conditions and limitation on my certificate of registration. (12) I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. (13) I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so. (14) I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College. (15) I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. (16) Public Register (a) I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register. (b) I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect: A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Zawahir engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of anesthesia. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Zawahir has ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services. D. CONSENT (17) I, Dr. Zawahir, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. (18) I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this Undertaking. (2 of 2) The certificate of registration held by Dr. Mohamed Maznawi Zawahir also carries the following term, condition and limitation imposed by the Registration Committee, effective November 18, 2010. Dr. Mohamed Maznawi Zawahir may practise medicine independently in anaesthesia, only.
Source: Member Active Date: June 30, 2017 Expiry Date: Summary: Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mohamed Maznawi Zawahir to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 30, 2017:A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Zawahir engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of anesthesia. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Zawahir has ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.