skip to content

Zawadowski, Andrew George Adam

CPSO#: 30799

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
109 Thomas St.
unit 69547
Oakville ON  L6J 7R4
Phone: (905) 842-2865 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew Zawadowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zawadowski ( CPSO# 30799 )

Business Address:
Suite 69547
109 Thomas Street
Oakville ON  L6J 7R4
Phone Number: (905) 842-2865

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW GEORGE ADAM ZAWADOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAWADOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1979