skip to content

Zavodni, Anna Elizabeth Helen

CPSO#: 94338

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
Eaton Building 14-217
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-3155 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416-530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 6477801135
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anna Zavodni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zavodni ( CPSO# 94338 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite D-470A
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5744

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Suite MCL 8-401
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 340-3155


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
USA - District of Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANNA ELIZABETH HELEN ZAVODNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAVODNI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 27 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 28 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010