skip to content

Zavery, Oanali Taherali

CPSO#: 29588

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2020
EXPIRY DATE
31 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: O. Zavery Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 1 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: MyHealth/ Cardiolgy /Outlook Ross Memorial Hospital 10 Angeline Street North Lindsay Ontario K9V4M8 1-705 201 5425
Date Received: 29 Dec 2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2020