skip to content

Zavalishina, Yelena

CPSO#: 97623

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unison Health & Community Services
12 Flemington Road
Toronto, ON
M6A2N4
Toronto ON  M4P 2H4
Phone: 416-787-1661
Fax: 416-787-3761 Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients should contact the clinic where they saw Dr. Zavalishina to request a copy of their medical record.
Date Received: 22 Mar 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Aug 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YELENA ZAVALISHINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAVALISHINA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014