Zarruk, Alexandro Ricardo (CPSO#: 96193)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Sint Eustatius, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
12774 Gouin Ouest
Pierrefonds QC  H8Z 1W5
Phone: 514 542 7979
Fax: 514 542 3999
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

462 Av. Saint charles
Dorion-Vaudreuil QC  J7V 2N5
Canada
Phone: 450-424-0031
Fax: 450-424-0032
County: 
Electoral District: 

160 Stillview
Pointe Claire QC  H9R 2Y2
Canada
Phone: (514) 630-2225
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRO RICARDO ZARRUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARRUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012