skip to content

Amini, Zarlasht

CPSO#: 99256

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian, Russian, Urdu

Education: Tashkent State Medical Institute, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trainyards Medical Centre
550 Terminal Avenue
Unit 22
Ottawa ON  K1G 0Z3
Phone: (613) 731-2244
Fax: (613) 260-4802 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ont
Pediatric Endocrinology Clinic
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: (613) 738-4236
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
Neonatology devision
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4267
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Pediatric service
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Brewer COVID community assessment c
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Zarlasht Amini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Amini ( CPSO# 99256 )

Business Address:
Unit 22
550 Terminal Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1G 0Z3
Phone Number: (613) 731-2244

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:14 Aug 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014 Active
             Dr. Zarlasht Amini may practise medicine independently in paediatrics, only.