skip to content

Zarins, Raymond Kenneth

CPSO#: 21829

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Oct 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 1997