skip to content

Zarinehbaf Asadi, Sanaz

CPSO#: 93013

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Turkish

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vaughan Pain clinic
3175 Rutherford Rd Suite #23
Concord ON  L4K 5Y6
Phone: (905) 761-1288 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

847 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L3B4
Canada
Phone: (905) 581-554
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

16715 Yonge St Unit 22B
Newmarket ON  L3X1X4
Canada
Phone: (905) 898-4184
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

775 Strand Blvd
Kingston ON  K7P 2S7
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Zarinehbaf Asadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zarinehbaf Asadi ( CPSO# 93013 )

Business Address:
23 - 3175 Rutherford Road
Concord ON  L4K 5Y6

Business Address:
847 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 3B4

Business Address:
16715 Yonge Street
Suite 22B
Newmarket ON  L3X 1X4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANAZ ZARINEHBAF ASADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARINEHBAF ASADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012