skip to content

Zaretsky, Ashley Brooke

CPSO#: 98075

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Family Physicians
377 Church Street, Suite 101
Markham, Ontario
L6B 1A1
Markham ON  L6B1A1
Phone: 905-471-9999
Fax: (905) 471-3627 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: 905-883-2455
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

#5-10 Meadowglen Drive
Whitby ON  L1R3P8
Canada
Phone: 647-872-9958
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ashley Zaretsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zaretsky ( CPSO# 98075 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6A 3Z2

Business Address:
Doctors on Call
10 Meadowglen Drive
Unit 5
Whitby ON  L1R 3P8
Phone Number: (647) 872-9958

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASHLEY BROOKE ZARETSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARETSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2015