skip to content

Zaniewski, Gregory Adam

CPSO#: 94336

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6849
Fax: (705) 743-4392 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G.A. Zaniewski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Zaniewski ( CPSO# 94336 )

Business Address:
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Suite 202
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 743-2040

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GREGORY ADAM ZANIEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZANIEWSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2011