skip to content

Zandi Riahi, Shervin

CPSO#: 98656

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shervin Zandi Riahi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zandi Riahi ( CPSO# 98656 )

Business Address:
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHERVIN ZANDI RIAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZANDI RIAHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016