skip to content

Zammit-Maempel, Joseph George

CPSO#: 97091

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Mar 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Maltese

Education:University of Dundee, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Family Health Centre
1338 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0G1
Phone: (905) 984-3335
Fax: (905) 984-6008 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Joseph George Zammit-Maempel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zammit-Maempel ( CPSO# 97091 )

Business Address:
Niagara Family Health Centre
1338 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0G1
Phone Number: (905) 984-3335

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSEPH GEORGE ZAMMIT-MAEMPEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMMIT-MAEMPEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 02 May 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 May 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2019