skip to content

Zamir, Orit

CPSO#: 93582

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
7th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6230
Fax: (416) 323-6356 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

550 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic Health Comp
20th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 416-596-4200
Fax: 416-586-5067
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Orit Zamir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Zamir ( CPSO# 93582 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ORIT ZAMIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015