skip to content

Zalan, Elise Julie

CPSO#: 98284

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Kingston General Hospital Site
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 6135487827 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

752 King St W
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

166 Brock St
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: 6135487827
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. E. J. Zalan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Zalan ( CPSO# 98284 )

Business Address:
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2

Business Address:
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:11 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELISE JULIE ZALAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZALAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 11 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 12 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 11 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 12 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2018